+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 10, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs