+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor