+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to Appropriations
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs