+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2016: House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .SB16-215
May 6, 2016: Senate Finance: . .SB16-215
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor