+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 4, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On May 3, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
On May 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/30/2024 - No Amendments
On April 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/29/2024 - No Amendments
On April 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs