+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Finance
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology