+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 3, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology