+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Business Affairs and Labor
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 4/6/2015 - No Amendments
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor