+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance