+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Finance
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy