+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary