+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education