+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation