+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor