+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Judiciary
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Judiciary
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
April 29, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 9-4.
April 29, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.003 The motion passed without objection.
April 10, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
April 10, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 6-1.
February 18, 2015: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (attachment G). The motion passed without objection.
February 18, 2015: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
February 11, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020, as amended, to the Committee on Judiciary. The motion passed on a vote of 9-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor