+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2013: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D). The motion passed without objection.
February 25, 2013: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 10-2, with one member excused.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor