+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services