+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Finance
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Finance
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Votes (3)
April 30, 2015: House Finance: . .SB15-199
March 12, 2015: Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: . .SB15-199
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor