+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary