+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary