+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Governor Action - Signed
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor