+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology