+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor