+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary