+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor