+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 3, 2016: House Judiciary: . .SB16-189
May 3, 2016: House Judiciary: . .SB16-189
May 3, 2016: House Judiciary: . .SB16-189
April 20, 2016: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .SB16-189
April 20, 2016: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .SB16-189
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor