+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations