+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Finance
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor