+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy