+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 20, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.003 The motion passed without objection.
March 20, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-186, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor