+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Re-referred to Finance - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Finance
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 28, 2015: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A). The motion passed without objection.
April 28, 2015: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-185, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 8-5.
April 16, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-185 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 4-1.
April 10, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-185, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 6-1.
April 10, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor