+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Adhere - CCR produced
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Adhere - CCR produced
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reject, Discharge and Appoint
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reject, Discharge and Appoint
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Conference Committee Result was to No Report
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Conference Committee Result was to No Report
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2017 - No Amendments
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/07/2017 - No Amendments
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/03/2017 - No Amendments
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/27/2017 - No Amendments
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2017 - No Amendments
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor