+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Finance
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
May 1, 2015: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment A). The motion passed without objection.
April 10, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-184, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 5-2.
April 10, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
March 17, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-184 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
March 12, 2015: Senate Education: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). The motion failed on a vote of 4-5.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor