+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology