+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education