+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary