+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 4, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-181 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 10-0.
March 18, 2013: House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E). The motion passed on a vote of 8-5.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor