+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor