+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Finance
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Finance
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation + Finance
+ − Votes (5)
March 18, 2015: House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 15-018 indefinitely. The motion passed on a vote of 7-4.
February 13, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-018 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor