+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Appropriations
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology