+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Education
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor