+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 12, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 8, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 5, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 4, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 27, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
On March 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs