+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations