+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/23/2014 - No Amendments
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor