+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor