+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Votes (8)
April 19, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-175 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 9-4.
March 18, 2013: House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B). The motion was withdrawn.
March 18, 2013: House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). The motion failed on a vote of 6-7.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor