+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to Appropriations
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Referred to Appropriations
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor