+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services