+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
March 12, 2013: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-170 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
February 27, 2013: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor