+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2018 - No Amendments
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor